Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Gottardi Cristelli, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Montevideo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1923BornFaida di Pené, Italy
15 Oct 195027.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
1 Mar 197248.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mercedes, Uruguay
1 Mar 197248.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bellicastrum
30 Apr 197248.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bellicastrum
22 May 197551.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
5 Jun 198561.7AppointedArchbishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
12 Jul 198561.8InstalledArchbishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
4 Dec 199875.2RetiredArchbishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
7 Mar 200581.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Montevideo, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for José Gottardi Cristelli:
Archbishop José Gottardi Cristelli S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Montevideo

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015