Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adalberto Arturo Rosat, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Aiquile, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1934Born
13 Jul 195824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
22 Nov 198652.8AppointedPrelate of Aiquile, Bolivia
1 Feb 198753.0Ordained BishopPrelate of Aiquile, Bolivia
25 Mar 200975.1RetiredPrelate of Aiquile, Bolivia
31 Jan 201581.0DiedPrelate Emeritus of Aiquile, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Adalberto Arturo Rosat
Bishop Adalberto Arturo Rosat O.F.M. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Aiquile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClès

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,148
  • ob: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 1,020
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: CB, 31 Jan 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast