Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Kaspar von Wolkenstein-Rodeneck

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trento

Titular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1705BornTrento
11 Jun 172924.4Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
15 Jul 174338.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trento, Italy
15 Jul 174338.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)
21 Sep 174338.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)
12 Apr 174439.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Johann Kaspar von Wolkenstein-Rodeneck:
Bishop Johann Kaspar von Wolkenstein-Rodeneck (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trento

  • a priest for 14.8 years
  • a bishop for .6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013