Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz von Lodron

Deceased

Bishop of Gurk


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1616¹BornTrento
30 Sep 164327.7AppointedBishop of Gurk, Austria
6 Mar 164428.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gurk, Austria
30 Nov 165236.9DiedBishop of Gurk, Austria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz von Lodron:
Bishop Franz von Lodron (died ) Bishop of Gurk

  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 200
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1644, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 22 Mar 2015