Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacinto (Giacinto) Eccher, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Aiquile, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1912Born
27 Jun 193725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
11 Dec 196149.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Garriana
16 Dec 196149.6AppointedPrelate of Aiquile, Bolivia
1 Apr 196249.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Garriana
7 Nov 197765.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Garriana
22 Nov 198674.5RetiredPrelate of Aiquile, Bolivia
10 Jan 199784.7DiedPrelate Emeritus of Aiquile, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Jacinto (Giacinto) Eccher
Bishop Jacinto (Giacinto) Eccher O.F.M. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Aiquile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastagnè San Vito, Diocese of Trento, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Vigilio, Cathedral, Trento, Archdiocese of Trento, Italy

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1962, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 4 Jul 2020

Quantcast