Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Johann Kaspar von Thun und Hohenstein

Deceased

Bishop of Passau, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1737Born
21 May 177134.0Ordained PriestPriest of Passau, Germany
16 Dec 177639.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
16 Dec 177639.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Thyatira
19 Jan 177739.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thyatira
4 Nov 179558.4SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
18 Dec 179558.5ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
7 Oct 179659.3DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Thomas Johann Kaspar von Thun und Hohenstein
Bishop Thomas Johann Kaspar von Thun und Hohenstein (born , died ) Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrento

  • a priest for 25.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1777, Number 2
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 330, and Page 406
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast