Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Negri, F.S.C.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Nilo Equatoriale

Titular Bishop of Barica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1889BornTres, Italy
10 Aug 191222.7Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
10 Dec 193445.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nilo Equatoriale, Uganda
10 Dec 193445.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Barica
5 May 193545.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Barica
13 Nov 194960.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Nilo Equatoriale, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Angelo Negri:
Bishop Angelo Negri F.S.C.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Nilo Equatoriale

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013