Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Franz Xavier (Franciszek Ksawery) Luschin (Luszin)

Deceased

Archbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1781BornTeinach
15 Aug 180422.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Gurk, Austria
26 Aug 180422.7Ordained PriestPriest of Gurk, Austria
10 Nov 182341.9SelectedBishop of Trento, Italy
24 May 182442.5ConfirmedBishop of Trento, Italy
3 Oct 182442.8Ordained BishopBishop of Trento, Italy
18 Mar 183452.3SelectedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
23 Jun 183452.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
Nov 183452.9InstalledArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
19 Feb 183553.2SelectedArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
6 Apr 183553.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
22 Aug 183553.7InstalledArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
2 May 185472.4DiedArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Franz Xavier (Franciszek Ksawery) Luschin (Luszin):
Archbishop Franz Xavier (Franciszek Ksawery) Luschin (Luszin) (born , died ) Archbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,376
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 205, and Page 236
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 377

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013