Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lauro Tisi

Archbishop of Trento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1962 Born
18 May 198623.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trento, Italy
26 Jun 198724.6Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
10 Feb 201653.2AppointedArchbishop of Trento, Italy
3 Apr 201653.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lauro Tisi
Archbishop Lauro Tisi (born ) Archbishop of Trento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGiustino, Archdiocese of Trento
Ordained DeaconSan Vigilio, Cathedral, Trento, Archdiocese of Trento
Ordained PriestSan Vigilio, Cathedral, Trento, Archdiocese of Trento
Ordained BishopSan Vigilio, Cathedral, Trento, Archdiocese of Trento

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Trento.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,889
  • loc: AM, 1 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast