Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Maria von Thun und Hohenstein

Deceased

Bishop of Passau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1713BornTrento
7 Oct 174128.4AppointedBishop of Gurk, Austria
18 Feb 174228.7Ordained BishopBishop of Gurk, Austria
19 Nov 176148.5SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
29 Mar 176248.8ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
15 Jun 176350.1DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Josef Maria von Thun und Hohenstein:
Bishop Josef Maria von Thun und Hohenstein (born , died ) Bishop of Passau

  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013