Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sigmund Alphons von Thun

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

Bishop of Trento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1621BornThun
24 Aug 164624.8Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
21 May 166341.6SelectedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
10 Dec 166342.1ConfirmedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
4 Jan 166442.2Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
9 Jan 166846.2SelectedBishop of Trento, Italy
9 Sep 166947.9ConfirmedBishop of Trento, Italy
2 Feb 167755.3DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sigmund Alphons von Thun:
Bishop Sigmund Alphons von Thun (born , died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a priest for 30.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 389
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 121

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013