Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}

Dioecesis Basileensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Felix Gmür, Bishop
  • Martin Gächter, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Denis Theurillat, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Hansjörg Vogel, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 8 March 1971
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Switzerland
  • Square Kilometers: 12,585 (4,860 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.bistum-basel.ch/
  • Mailing Address: Bischofliches Ordinariat, Baselstrasse 58, CH-4500 Solothurn, Schweiz
  • Telephone: (032)625.58.25/41
  • Fax: 625.58.45

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Basel
740ErectedDiocese of Basel (erected)
2 May 1818Territory AddedDiocese of Konstanz {Constance} Diocese of Basel
Diocese of Basel e Lugano
7 September 1888Name ChangedDiocese of Basel Diocese of Basel e Lugano
Diocese of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}
8 March 1971SplitDiocese of Basel e Lugano Diocese of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}
Diocese of Lugano

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Basel e Lugano
1950623,7611,192,48352.3%9001751,0755801751,000452ap1951
1959765,0002,250,00034.0%970239937702301,380490ap1960
1966930,0002,400,00038.8%9661001,0668723001,400510ap1967
19701,024,0002,674,00038.3%9833201,3037854502,850485ap1971
Diocese of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}
19701,024,0002,674,00038.3%9833201,3037854502,850485ap1971
19801,163,0002,708,00042.9%8653901,25592684712,900529ap1981
19901,100,0002,800,00039.3%7543751,129974334552,700530ap1991
19991,120,0003,000,00037.3%5972918881,261683472,235533ap2000
20001,120,0003,000,00037.3%5852918761,278683482,235533ap2001
20011,120,0003,000,00037.3%5852918761,278683472,235533ap2002
20021,115,7752,889,94438.6%5572918481,315663452,235503ap2003
20031,115,7752,889,94438.6%5492918401,328663452,235503ap2004
20041,000,0002,800,00035.7%5402567961,256853092,235527ap2005
20061,070,0973,017,53135.5%4922757671,395933292,235525ap2007
20121,094,0003,096,00035.3%4342416751,6201173042,235520ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.3, 15 Nov 2014; Data: 17 Nov 2014