Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Eugene-Jean Imhof, S.M.B. †

Deceased

Prefect of Qiqihar [Tsitsihar], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1899Born
23 Dec 192223.8Ordained PriestPriest
Sep 1924³25.5ProfessedPriest of Society of Bethlehem Mission Immensee
28 Apr 192930.2AppointedSuperior of Tsitsihar [Qiqihar], China
13 Jul 193132.4AppointedPrefect of Qiqihar [Tsitsihar], China
17 Jan 193434.9DiedPrefect of Qiqihar [Tsitsihar], China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eugene-Jean Imhof
Father Eugene-Jean Imhof S.M.B. (born , died ) Prefect of Qiqihar [Tsitsihar]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAargau, Diocese of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
Death PlaceHeilungkiang

  • a priest for 11.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 10 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 11 Jan 2020

Quantcast