Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Kaspar Schnorf

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Basel, Switzerland

Titular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1625Born
18 Feb 164721.3Ordained PriestPriest of Basel, Switzerland
4 Jul 166135.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Basel, Switzerland
4 Jul 166135.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
8 Jan 166236.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
10 Jun 170478.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Basel, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Johann Kaspar Schnorf
Bishop Johann Kaspar Schnorf (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Basel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaden
Ordained BishopDelemont
Death PlaceArlesheim

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 150
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1662, Number 2
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 47, Number 3,194

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 14 Jun 2020

Quantcast