Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Baptist von Reinach-Hirzbach

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Basel, Switzerland

Titular Bishop of Abdera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1669³Born
16 Nov 171041.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Basel, Switzerland
7 Dec 171041.7Ordained PriestPriest of Basel, Switzerland
2 Sep 172455.4SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Basel, Switzerland
11 Jun 172556.2ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Basel, Switzerland
11 Jun 172556.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Abdera
25 Nov 172556.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abdera
25 Jan 173464.8DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Basel, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Baptist von Reinach-Hirzbach
Bishop Johann Baptist von Reinach-Hirzbach (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Basel

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorrentruy
Ordained BishopPorrentruy

  • a priest for 23.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 65, and Page 115
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 46
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 47, Number 3,210

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 14 Jun 2020

Quantcast