Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christoph von Utenheim

Deceased

Bishop of Basel, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1450¹Born
8 Mar 150353.1AppointedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
28 May 150454.4Ordained BishopBishop of Basel, Switzerland
16 Mar 152777.2DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Christoph von Utenheim (VIAF: 64412735)
Bishop Christoph von Utenheim (born 1450, died ) Bishop of Basel

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Basel, Diocese of Basel

  • a bishop for 22.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 130
  • b/c3: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1504, Number 10
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 47, Number 3,150

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 13 Jun 2020

Quantcast