Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon Nikolaus Euseb von Montjoye-Hirsingen

Deceased

Bishop of Basel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1693BornHirsingen
22 Dec 173138.3Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
26 Oct 176269.1SelectedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
21 Mar 176369.5ConfirmedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
10 Jul 176369.8Ordained BishopBishop of Basel, Switzerland
5 Apr 177581.5DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Simon Nikolaus Euseb von Montjoye-Hirsingen:
Bishop Simon Nikolaus Euseb von Montjoye-Hirsingen (born , died ) Bishop of Basel

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013