Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Baptist Haus

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Basel

Titular Bishop of Messalum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1672BornStein-Säckingen
16 Jun 169623.9Ordained PriestPriest of Basel, Switzerland
17 Aug 172957.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Basel, Switzerland
17 Aug 172957.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Messalum
18 Sep 172957.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Messalum
29 Oct 174573.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Basel, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Johann Baptist Haus:
Bishop Johann Baptist Haus (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Basel

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013