Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Rinck von Balderstein

Deceased

Bishop of Basel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1566¹Born
4 Feb 160943.0AppointedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
12 Jul 160943.5Ordained BishopBishop of Basel, Switzerland
23 Oct 162862.8DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Rinck von Balderstein:
Bishop Wilhelm Rinck von Balderstein (died ) Bishop of Basel

  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 111
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1609, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015