Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henri d’Isny, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz


Events

DateEventTitle
1275¹AppointedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
9 Oct 1275Ordained BishopBishop of Basel, Switzerland
15 May 1286AppointedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
17 Mar 1288DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henri d’Isny:
Archbishop Henri d’Isny O.F.M. (died ) Archbishop of Mainz

  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 129, and Page 322
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,096

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 4 Jan 2014