Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich Xaver Odo Fiala

Deceased

Bishop of Basel, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1817Born
23 May 184123.8Ordained PriestPriest of Basel, Switzerland
15 May 188567.8AppointedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
17 May 188567.8Ordained BishopBishop of Basel, Switzerland
24 May 188870.8DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Xaver Odo Fiala (VIAF: 77535266)
Bishop Friedrich Xaver Odo Fiala (born , died ) Bishop of Basel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNidau, Diocese of Basel
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 142
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017