Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Jakob Rinck von Balderstein

Deceased

Bishop of Basel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1624BornBirseck
22 Sep 165127.7Ordained PriestPriest of Basel, Switzerland
3 Aug 168864.6SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Basel, Switzerland
27 Sep 169066.7ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Basel, Switzerland
27 Sep 169066.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Curium
26 Aug 169167.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Curium
13 Jul 169369.5SucceededBishop of Basel, Switzerland
4 Jun 170581.4DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Jakob Rinck von Balderstein:
Bishop Wilhelm Jakob Rinck von Balderstein (born , died ) Bishop of Basel

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013