Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Venningen

Deceased

Bishop of Basel, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1409²Born
17 May 145849.3SelectedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
12 Jul 145849.5ConfirmedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
8 Apr 145950.2Ordained BishopBishop of Basel, Switzerland
20 Dec 147869.9DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann von Venningen (VIAF: 51647726)
Bishop Johann von Venningen (born 1409, died ) Bishop of Basel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNiedenstein
Death PlacePorrentruy

  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 102
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,899
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1459, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Oct 2018

Quantcast