Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valerio Lazzeri

Bishop of Lugano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1963 BornDongio
2 Sep 198926.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lugano, Switzerland
4 Nov 201350.2AppointedBishop of Lugano, Switzerland
7 Dec 201350.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lugano, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Valerio Lazzeri:
Bishop Valerio Lazzeri (born ) Bishop of Lugano

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lugano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2013
  • ob: CB, 4 Nov 2013
  • c2+: CB, 26 Nov 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2013, Number 157
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,990

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015