Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Baer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Basel, Switzerland

Titular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Aug 1599AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Basel, Switzerland
2 Aug 1599AppointedTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
21 May 1600Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
17 Sep 1611DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Basel, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for François Baer
Bishop François Baer (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Basel

  • a bishop for 11.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 150
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1600, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast