Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Hänggi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1917BornNunningen
2 Jul 194124.4Ordained PriestPriest of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
4 Dec 196750.8SelectedBishop of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
20 Dec 196750.9ConfirmedBishop of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
11 Feb 196851.0Ordained BishopBishop of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
21 Jun 198265.4ResignedBishop of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland
21 Jun 199477.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Anton Hänggi:
Bishop Anton Hänggi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015