Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Joseph Gobel] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of [Paris (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1727Born
19 Dec 175023.3Ordained PriestPriest of Basel, Switzerland
27 Jan 177244.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Basel, Switzerland
27 Jan 177244.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lydda
22 Mar 177244.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lydda
17 Mar 179163.5SelectedBishop of [Paris (Constitutional), France]
13 Apr 179163.6RemovedAuxiliary Bishop of Basel, Switzerland
13 Apr 179163.6RemovedTitular Bishop of Lydda
26 Apr 179466.6DiedBishop of [Paris (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Joseph Gobel (VIAF: 19715651)
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Joseph Gobel (born , died ) Bishop of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThann
Ordained BishopBellelay
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 270, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast