Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Melchior Lichtenfeld (Lichtenfels)

Deceased

Bishop of Basel, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1517¹Born
4 Dec 155538.9AppointedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
2 Oct 156952.7Ordained BishopBishop of Basel, Switzerland
17 May 157558.3DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Melchior Lichtenfeld (Lichtenfels) (VIAF: 315523550)
Bishop Melchior Lichtenfeld (Lichtenfels) (born 1517, died ) Bishop of Basel

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Marcel, Delémont, Diocese of Basel
Death PlacePorrentruy, Diocese of Basel

  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 130
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1569, Number 16
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 47, Number 3,155

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 13 Jun 2020

Quantcast