Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Anton Salzmann

Deceased

Bishop of Basel, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1780Born
11 Apr 180322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
10 Dec 182848.6SelectedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
18 May 182949.0ConfirmedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
26 Jul 182949.2Ordained BishopBishop of Basel, Switzerland
23 Apr 185473.9DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Josef Anton Salzmann (VIAF: 77076346)
Bishop Josef Anton Salzmann (born , died ) Bishop of Basel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucerne

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,527
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 106
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,829, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast