Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe von Gundelsheim

Deceased

Bishop of Basel, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1487²Born
28 Feb 152740.1SelectedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
31 Aug 152740.6ConfirmedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
21 Dec 152740.9Ordained BishopBishop of Basel, Switzerland
14 Sep 155366.7DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philippe von Gundelsheim
Bishop Philippe von Gundelsheim (born 1487, died ) Bishop of Basel

  • a bishop for 25.7 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,596
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 130

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018