Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cândido Bento Maria Penso, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Goiás, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1895Born
30 Jul 192227.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
19 Jul 194752.1AppointedPrelate of Bananal, Brazil
19 Jul 194752.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Coela
4 Jan 194852.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coela
17 Jan 195761.6AppointedBishop of Goiás, Brazil
27 Nov 195964.5DiedBishop of Goiás, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Cândido Bento Maria Penso
Bishop Cândido Bento Maria Penso O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Goiás

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBellinzona, Switzerland

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast