Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bruno Bernard Heim

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Great Britain

Titular Archbishop of Xanthus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1911BornOlten
29 Jun 193827.3Ordained PriestPriest of Basel, Switzerland
9 Nov 196150.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Xanthus
9 Nov 196150.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Scandinavia
10 Dec 196150.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Xanthus
16 Feb 196654.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Finland
7 May 196958.2AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Egypt, Arab Republic of
16 Jul 197362.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Great Britain
22 Feb 198271.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Great Britain
Jul 198574.3ResignedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Great Britain
18 Mar 200392.0DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Bruno Bernard Heim:
Archbishop Bruno Bernard Heim (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Great Britain

  • a priest for 64.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013