Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Candolfi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland

Titular Bishop of Frequentium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1922Born
1 Jul 194724.9Ordained PriestPriest of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
1 Jun 198360.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland
1 Jun 198360.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Frequentium
29 Jun 198360.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Frequentium
30 Mar 199673.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland
7 Aug 201189.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Joseph Candolfi (VIAF: 88810991)
Bishop Joseph Candolfi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReconvilier

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 8 Aug 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast