Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hansjörg Vogel

Bishop Emeritus of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1951 Born
28 Nov 197625.6Ordained PriestPriest of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland
14 Jan 199442.8SelectedBishop of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland
3 Feb 199442.8ConfirmedBishop of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland
4 Apr 199443.0Ordained BishopBishop of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland
2 Jun 199544.2ResignedBishop of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Hansjörg Vogel (VIAF: 10486078)
Bishop Hansjörg Vogel (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBern

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,309

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast