Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Konrad von Roggenbach

Deceased

Bishop of Basel, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1618Born
4 Apr 165435.3Ordained PriestPriest of Basel, Switzerland
22 Dec 165638.0SelectedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
13 Jan 165940.0ConfirmedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
23 Mar 165940.2Ordained BishopBishop of Basel, Switzerland
13 Jul 169374.5DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Johann Konrad von Roggenbach
Bishop Johann Konrad von Roggenbach (born , died ) Bishop of Basel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRhein

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 111
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018