Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Joseph Sigismund von Roggenbach

Deceased

Bishop of Basel, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1726³Born
1 Jun 176538.6Ordained PriestPriest of Basel, Switzerland
25 Nov 178256.1SelectedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
18 Jul 178356.7ConfirmedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
29 Sep 178356.9Ordained BishopBishop of Basel, Switzerland
9 Mar 179467.4DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Joseph Sigismund von Roggenbach
Bishop Franz Joseph Sigismund von Roggenbach (born , died ) Bishop of Basel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZwingen Lauger

  • a priest for 28.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 24
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 117

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast