Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Konrad von Reinach-Hirzbach

Deceased

Bishop of Basel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1657³BornMichelstadt
22 Sep 169134.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Basel, Switzerland
20 Sep 169235.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basel, Switzerland
11 Jul 170547.8SelectedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
5 Sep 170548.0ConfirmedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
1 Nov 170548.1Ordained BishopBishop of Basel, Switzerland
19 Mar 173779.5DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Konrad von Reinach-Hirzbach:
Bishop Johann Konrad von Reinach-Hirzbach (born , died ) Bishop of Basel

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 115
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 17 Jun 2015