Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter von Aspelt

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1240¹BornTrier
31 Mar 129757.2AppointedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
10 Nov 130666.8AppointedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
5 Jun 132080.4DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter von Aspelt
Archbishop Peter von Aspelt (born 1240, died ) Archbishop of Mainz

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 322, and Page 129
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,769
  • ob/c2: ATh

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Feb 2016