Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Beat Albrecht von Ramstein

Deceased

Bishop of Basel, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1594Born
29 Nov 164652.3SelectedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
164752.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Aug 165056.1ConfirmedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
1 May 165156.7Ordained BishopBishop of Basel, Switzerland
25 Aug 165157.1DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Beat Albrecht von Ramstein
Bishop Beat Albrecht von Ramstein (born , died ) Bishop of Basel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaldighofen

  • a priest for 4.6 years
  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 111
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast