Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernesto Togni

Bishop Emeritus of Lugano, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1926 Born
7 May 195023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lugano, Switzerland
15 Jul 197851.7AppointedBishop of Lugano, Switzerland
17 Sep 197851.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lugano, Switzerland
21 Jun 198558.7ResignedBishop of Lugano, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Ernesto Togni
Bishop Ernesto Togni (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lugano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrione Verzasca

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lugano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Apr 2017