Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Benno (Walter) Cardinal Gut, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Divine Worship

Cardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1897Born
6 Jan 191820.7EnteredMember of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Jul 192124.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Apr 194750.0SelectedAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland
26 Apr 194750.0ConfirmedAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland
5 May 194750.0InstalledAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland
24 Sep 195962.4AppointedAbbot Primate of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Jun 196770.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thuccabora
18 Jun 196770.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thuccabora
26 Jun 196770.2Elevated to Cardinal
29 Jun 196770.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
8 Sep 196770.4ResignedAbbot Primate of Order of Saint Benedict
8 Jan 196870.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
7 May 196972.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Divine Worship
8 Dec 197073.6DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Divine Worship

MicroData Summary for Benno (Walter) Gut (VIAF: 34100553)
Benno (Walter) Cardinal Gut O.S.B. (born , died ) Prefect of Divine Worship

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReiden, Diocese of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopMaria Einsiedeln, Abbey, Territorial Abbey of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Maria Einsiedeln, Territorial Abbey of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
  • a cardinal for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Jun 1967

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 14 Sep 2021

Quantcast