Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonhard Haas

Deceased

Bishop of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1833Born
25 Mar 185824.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Basel, Switzerland
26 Mar 185824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Basel, Switzerland
11 Jul 188854.7SelectedBishop of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
28 Sep 188854.9ConfirmedBishop of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
18 Oct 188854.9Ordained BishopBishop of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
14 May 190672.5DiedBishop of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Leonhard Haas (VIAF: 122111575)
Bishop Leonhard Haas (born , died ) Bishop of Basel e Lugano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHorw

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 142
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jun 2017