Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Utrecht

Archidioecesis Ultraiectensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Erected: 4 March 1853
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Netherlands
  • Square Kilometers: 10,000 (3,862 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.aartsbisdom.nl/
  • Mailing Address: Aartsbisdom, Maliebaan 38-40, 3581 CR Utrecht; P.B. 14019, 3508 SB Utrech, Nederland
  • Telephone: (030)233.80.30
  • Fax: 231.19.62

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Utrecht
695ErectedDiocese of Utrecht (erected)
12 May 1559Territory LostDiocese of Münster
Diocese of Utrecht
Diocese of Groningen (erected)
12 May 1559Territory LostDiocese of Utrecht Diocese of Haarlem (erected)
12 May 1559Territory LostDiocese of Münster
Diocese of Utrecht
Diocese of Deventer (erected)
12 May 1559Territory LostDiocese of Utrecht Diocese of Leeuwarden (erected)
Archdiocese of Utrecht
12 May 1559Territory LostDiocese of Cambrai
Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}
Archdiocese of Utrecht
Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand} (erected)
12 May 1559ElevatedDiocese of Utrecht Archdiocese of Utrecht
1580SuppressedArchdiocese of Utrecht (suppressed)
Archdiocese of Utrecht
4 March 1853ErectedMission "Sui Iuris" of Batavia (Holland Mission) Archdiocese of Utrecht (erected)
16 July 1955Territory LostArchdiocese of Utrecht Diocese of Groningen (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Utrecht
1950624,0001,872,00033.3%729729855377ap1951
1969849,9822,856,44929.8%768127895949127355ap1971
1980942,0003,266,00028.8%4725501,02292119503,000359ap1981
1990901,8623,521,32225.6%3785148921,011247942,383362ap1991
1999800,0003,000,00026.7%2762762,898551531,550355ap2000
2000852,7523,751,37922.7%2741083822,232602561,551348ap2001
2001835,8233,779,49922.1%2861083942,121542791,335218ap2002
2002834,3483,783,69922.1%2853436281,328635081,259342ap2003
2003832,0683,937,37621.1%2523325841,424624911,137316ap2004
2004829,1843,836,64921.6%2623155771,437694631,057336ap2005
2010757,0003,979,00019.0%2142114251,78185320697234ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 11 Mar 2014