Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude Germain Berthold, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ubon Ratchathani, Thailand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1923Born
6 Dec 195229.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of La Société des Missions Etrangères
31 May 195330.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
9 Apr 197047.0AppointedBishop of Ubon Ratchathani, Thailand
17 Jul 197047.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ubon Ratchathani, Thailand
24 May 197653.1ResignedBishop of Ubon Ratchathani, Thailand
21 Feb 199470.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Ubon Ratchathani, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Claude Germain Berthold
Bishop Claude Germain Berthold M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ubon Ratchathani

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOcourt, Jura, Diocese of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
Ordained DeaconForeign Missions, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestForeign Missions, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ubon Ratchathani, Diocese of Ubon Ratchathani
Death PlaceUbon Ratchathani, Diocese of Ubon Ratchathani

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • od/op/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 5 Jul 2018

Quantcast