Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnold von Rotperg

Deceased

Bishop of Basel, Switzerland


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Mar 1451AppointedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
13 Jun 1451Ordained BishopBishop of Basel, Switzerland
7 May 1458DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Arnold von Rotperg
Bishop Arnold von Rotperg (died ) Bishop of Basel

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBale, Diocese of Basel
Death PlaceBale, Diocese of Basel

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 102
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,595
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1451, Number 5
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 47, Number 3,148

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast