Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Joseph Wilhelm Aloys Rinck von Baldenstein

Deceased

Bishop of Basel, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1704³Born
31 Mar 173632.1Ordained PriestPriest of Basel, Switzerland
22 Jan 174439.9SelectedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
13 Apr 174440.1ConfirmedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
22 Nov 174440.7Ordained BishopBishop of Basel, Switzerland
13 Sep 176258.5DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georg Joseph Wilhelm Aloys Rinck von Baldenstein
Bishop Georg Joseph Wilhelm Aloys Rinck von Baldenstein (born , died ) Bishop of Basel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaignelégier

  • a priest for 26.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 117
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 32
  • mn/ln/ob/c2+: ATh, 3 Jan 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,783

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast