Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Konstanz {Constance}

Dioecesis Constantinensis

Suppressed

To: Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau and Diocese of Rottenburg



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
6th CenturyErectedDiocese of Helvetii / Aventicum [Avenches] / Vindonissa [Windisch] (suppressed) Diocese of Konstanz {Constance} (erected)
Diocese of Lausanne (erected)
810Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Konstanz {Constance} (was Immediately Subject to Holy See)
1 April 1818Territory LostDiocese of Konstanz {Constance} Diocese of Augsburg
Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}
2 May 1818Territory LostDiocese of Konstanz {Constance} Diocese of Basel
Diocese of Chur
16 August 1821SuppressedDiocese of Konstanz {Constance} (suppressed) Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau (erected)
Diocese of Rottenburg (erected)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 204
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.2.8, 23 Apr 2019; Data: 22 May 2019

Quantcast