Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakob Sigismund von Reinach-Steinbrunn

Deceased

Bishop of Basel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1683BornObersteinbrunn
18 Sep 171734.1Ordained PriestPriest of Basel, Switzerland
4 Jun 173753.8SelectedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
30 Sep 173754.1ConfirmedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
29 Jun 173854.9Ordained BishopBishop of Basel, Switzerland
16 Dec 174360.3DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Jakob Sigismund von Reinach-Steinbrunn:
Bishop Jakob Sigismund von Reinach-Steinbrunn (born , died ) Bishop of Basel

  • a priest for 26.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die BischŲfe der Deutschsprachigen Lšnder
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013