Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe II Maria Traversi di Pereta

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Marittima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1779³BornPitigliano
6 Feb 180323.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 182546.3AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
21 Dec 182546.3Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
27 Aug 187293.0DiedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe II Maria Traversi di Pereta:
Bishop Giuseppe II Maria Traversi di Pereta (born , died ) Bishop of Massa Marittima

  • a priest for 69.5 years
  • a bishop for 46.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 256

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015