Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Pietro Losana

Deceased

Bishop of Biella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1793BornVigone
23 Jan 182734.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Abydus
22 Apr 182734.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abydus
21 Aug 183340.5SelectedBishop of Biella, Italy
30 Sep 183340.6ConfirmedBishop of Biella, Italy
14 Feb 187380.0DiedBishop of Biella, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Pietro Losana (VIAF: 81812857)
Bishop Giovanni Pietro Losana (born , died ) Bishop of Biella

  • a bishop for 45.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 56, and Page 121
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1827, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Jun 2016